HI SB80 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Re-Referred to WAM/TRE.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Re-Referred to WAM/TRE.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds for the planning and design of an improved four-lane roadway crossing the state right-of-way and connecting to Renton road in West Loch Villages, a sidewalk, bike path, and complete intersection with Renton road. (SD1)
Title
Transportation; General Obligation Bonds; West Loch Villages; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM/TRE. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to TRE. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2237) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to TRE. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in TRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE will hold a public decision making on 02-11-16 2:47PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRA. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |