HI SB80 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that revenue bonds issued by the agribusiness development corporation to enable the purchase of private agricultural lands shall not be subject to state or local taxation.
Title
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2009-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-09 3:15 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=80&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB80_.HTM |