HI SB799 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds out of the works of art special fund to the State foundation on culture and the arts for the integration of works of art projects into several major capital improvement projects.
Title
Making An Appropriation To The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB799 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=799&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB799_.HTM |