HI SB798 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB798
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the digitization of records, files, and other materials of the state historic preservation division to be expended by the department of land and natural resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB798 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Budget
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Digitization of Records, Files, and Other Materials of the State Historic Preservation Division
Budget
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Digitization of Records, Files, and Other Materials of the State Historic Preservation Division