HI SB797 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes notice, reporting, and use requirements for any entity or person that uses pesticides under certain circumstances.
Title
Pesticide; Health; Disclosure
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/HTH/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to AGL/HTH/ENE, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/AGL/ENE. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to AGL/HTH/ENE, CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=797&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB797_.HTM |