HI SB796 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the age of passengers prohibited from riding in the bed of a pickup truck under certain conditions from twelve or under to under eighteen years of age. Deems passengers in the bed of a pickup truck to have assumed the risk of injury or death from an accident or injury occurring while the vehicle is in operation.
Title
Relating To Passengers Riding In Bed Of Pickup Trucks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB796 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRE, JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=796&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB796_.HTM |