HI SB786 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 170, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Hawaii Revised Statutes and Hawaii Administrative Rules to substitute references to "medical marijuana" and like terms with "medical cannabis" and like terms. Requires the Department of Health to make all conforming revisions to Administrative Rules upon their next amendment and to other documents and items by December 31, 2019. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 170, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
2017-07-12SenateAct 170, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 45) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 45).
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nishimoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Nishihara.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Tupola.
2017-04-06HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514).
2017-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 396).
2017-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-29HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott.
2017-03-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-03-21HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
2017-03-20HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 263) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-03-02SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2017-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB37 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback