HI SB785 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB785

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for collective bargaining cost items for the members of collective bargaining units (2), (3), (4), (7), (8), (9), (13), and (14) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative, for fiscal biennium 2019-2021. Appropriates moneys to meet collective bargaining requirements under emergency medical services contracts. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Collective Bargaining.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-06-26SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 368).
2020-06-26HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 542).
2020-06-26HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Kong, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Wildberger excused (2).
2020-06-26SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella, Kim, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Ruderman, Wakai . 3 No(es): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Riviere, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-24HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 06-26-20.
2020-06-24HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 2-20) as amended in (CD 1).
2020-06-24Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 06-26-20.
2020-06-24SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 2-20).
2020-06-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Luke, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 06-23-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 364).
2020-06-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 537).
2020-06-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2020-06-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
2020-06-22HouseReceived notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
2020-06-19SenateSenate Conferee(s) discharged.
2020-06-19HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 546).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1951), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1295) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseRe-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 32
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 245) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1074) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB392 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB785 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback