HI SB783 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB783
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a private cause of action for persons injured by the deprivation of rights under the United States Constitution or the Hawaii Constitution by law enforcement officers. Requires that employers of law enforcement officers indemnify officers for judgments or settlements arising from that cause of action over a certain amount. Requires political subdivisions of the State who employ law enforcement officers to publicly disclose a list of officers against whom a judgment or settlement is entered as well as the amount of the judgment or settlement and any disciplinary actions or criminal charges brought against the officer.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB666 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB783 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB783 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=783&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB783_.HTM |