HI SB779 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the district courts' jurisdictional limit for civil actions involving specific performance.
Title
District Courts; Civil Actions; Jurisdiction; Specific Performance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8). |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 33). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 610) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=779&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB779_.HTM |