HI SB777 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB777

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a criminal statute for the criminal destruction of a tree on state or county property punishable as a misdemeanor. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Criminal Destruction Of Trees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-08SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB777 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback