HI SB772 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 226, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the requirement that there be attached a clear and legible notice, placard, or marker upon the faucet, spigot, or outlet wherefrom the draught beer is drawn. Requires rules adopted by the counties related to stacking of beer to refer to a standard serving of total volume that shall not exceed thirty-two ounces of total volume before a customer at any one time. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Liquor Laws.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 226, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
2019-07-09HouseAct 226, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 13) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 13).
2019-04-17HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, C. Lee, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 2:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2202) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-04-02HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-02HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19 2:05pm.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-27HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-29-19 at 2:00PM.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HousePass First Reading
2019-03-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 21).
2019-03-01SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 763) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 9:15AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1172 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback