HI SB767 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB767

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Legalizes the personal use, possession, and sale of cannabis in a specified quantity. Requires licensing to operate cannabis establishments. Subjects cannabis establishments to excise taxes and income taxes. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 269) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere. Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Fevella ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB767 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback