HI SB766 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB766
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an excise tax on basalt cinder and trap rock sold by wholesalers or dealers. Provides that the excise tax is paid into the Pacific international space center for exploration systems special fund. Requires moneys in excess of $1,000,000 in the Pacific international space center for exploration systems special fund to lapse to the general fund.
Title
Relating To The Pacific International Space Center For Exploration Systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on ETT deferred the measure. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT deferred the measure until 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB766 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
HB574 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to ETT, WAM.
HB574 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to ETT, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=766&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB766_.HTM |