HI SB764 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB764
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the High Technology Development Corporation for the Manufacturing Development Program. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The High Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB764 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.