HI SB756 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans, beginning January 1, 2020, the import for profit, sale, and offer for sale of any cosmetic in the State, if the final product or any component of the product was developed or manufactured using animal testing performed on or after January 1, 2020. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
Relating To Cosmetics.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB704 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB756 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
SB756 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=756&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB756_.HTM |