HI SB755 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB755

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the agricultural housing task force within the office of planning to study existing county and state laws, rules, and processes for construction of employee housing within agricultural districts to identify barriers to construction, make recommendations, and propose one master use application process to be applied throughout the State. Directs the task force to give special consideration to modular housing as a solution and make a legal designation, as it relates to zoning, between homes with a permanent foundation and modular homes without a permanent foundation. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from AEN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to AEN/HOU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1101 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB755 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback