HI SB752 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation to the University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources for research and prevention of the spread of ornamental ginger pathogens. (SB752 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kim, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 747).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2144) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Nishimoto, Yamashita.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from AGR/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1507), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
2019-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR/LHE on Friday, 03-15-19 2:25PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to AGR/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 231) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-12-19 3:35PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB833 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback