HI SB752 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the agricultural land acquisition special fund for the purchase of agricultural land by the agribusiness development corporation for the protection of agricultural lands, land banking, promotion of farm ownership, and agricultural diversity. Allocates an unspecified portion of the environmental response, energy, and food security tax to be deposited into the special fund. Requires the agribusiness development corporation to report annually to the legislature.
Title
Agribusiness Development Corporation; Agricultural Land Acquisition Fund; Environmental Response, Energy, and Food Security Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1018 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=752&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB752_.HTM |