HI SB750 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB750
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a capital improvement project for the Honalo marshalling yard.
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects For The Benefit Of The Honalo Marshalling Yard.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB770 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB750 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
SB750 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=750&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB750_.HTM |