HI SB736 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB736
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants tuition waivers to University of Hawaii community college students who meet certain criteria.
Title
Relating To Community College.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB736 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=736&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB736_.HTM |