HI SB734 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB734
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the agency or appropriate court that receives an income withholding request from an obligee to enter an order requiring the obligor's place of employment to classify the obligor as an employee for payroll or accounting purposes in order to become subject to withholding; provided that the obligor receives income on a periodic basis and becomes delinquent in making payments under a support order in an amount at least equal to the support payable for three months. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/LCA, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB734 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.