HI SB733 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the law for determining school impact fees for financing new or expanding existing DOE schools or facilities. (SD2)
Title
DOE; School Impact Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 45 | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Hanohano, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ching, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Chang, Manahan. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-16-09 2:00 PM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EDN, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 230) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Hemmings). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Kidani, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-18-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-13-09 1:15 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 2-2-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |