HI SB732 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB732
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Re-Referred to TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Re-Referred to TRS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts accessory dwelling units within one-half mile of a rail transit station or bus stop from off-street parking or parking stall requirements.
Title
Relating To Parking Requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/HOU, WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB732 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Re-Referred to TRS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=732&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB732_.HTM |