HI SB729 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends ballot requirements to display candidates for the board of trustees, office of Hawaiian affairs, by residency and non-residency requirements and to randomize the order of candidate names within those groupings.
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
SB729 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB729 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.