HI SB720 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB720
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county council members to caucus during official council meetings.
Title
Relating To County Council Meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:30PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB720 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=720&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB720_.HTM |