HI SB720 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB720
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands access to medicaid home and community-based services to include individuals who require home care services more than twice weekly, do not have ready access to reliable transportation, and live thirty miles or more from the nearest hospital. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB720 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.