HI SB715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB715
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes parental rights for blind parents or prospective blind parents in the context of child welfare, foster care, family law, and adoption.
Title
Relating To A Right To Parent For Blind Persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB715 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=715&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB715_.HTM |