HI SB715 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 096, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 096, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the Executive Director of the Hawaii Community Development Authority and the Executive Director of the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to the Special Action Team on Affordable Rental Housing. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Special Action Team On Affordable Rental Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 096, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 096, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 631). |
2017-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 725). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 1). |
2017-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-27-17. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 1) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Harimoto. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 471). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1674), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3). |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Say, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 244) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 27) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |