HI SB715 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the ten per cent ethanol by volume requirement for gasoline sold in Hawaii for use in motor vehicles. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Fuel; Gasoline; Ethanol; Ten Per Cent Requirement; Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 161) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from CPN/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN/ENE, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |