HI SB713 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB713
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Aha Moku Advisory Committee on July 1, 2021. Effective 6/30/2021.
Title
Relating To The Aha Moku Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The recommendation was not adopted. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): none; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB713 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The recommendation was not adopted.
SB713 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - The recommendation was not adopted.