HI SB703 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB703
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows use of the special land and development fund for the management, maintenance, and development of state parks, beaches, and other natural resources. Allocates two per cent of the transient accommodations tax to the special land and development fund category for the management, maintenance, and development of trails and trail access, state parks, beaches, and other natural resources. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Visitor Impacts.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT/WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:40PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT/WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB703 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.