HI SB701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB701
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs OHA to convene a task force to determine appropriate sources for authenticating and verifying appropriate Hawaiian language usage and syntax in public documents, letterhead, emblems, and symbols and establish a process for review. Requires OHA to report to the 2020 Legislature. (SB701 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Language.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1531), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-13-19 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN/LCA, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).