HI SB700 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB700
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an emergency appropriation to the Department of Education to address the anticipated budget shortfall in utilities and school food services.
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Education For Utilities And School Food Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB700 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=700&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB700_.HTM |