HI SB7 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services, in collaboration with the Department of Health, to review the progress of the Hawaii Pathways Project pilot and continue efforts to use Medicaid to provide supportive housing services for chronically homeless individuals. Appropriates funds to restore basic adult dental benefits to Medicaid enrollees; provided DHS obtains maximum federal matching funds available for the expenditure. Requires DHS to submit a report to the Legislature before the 2019 Regular Session. (SB7 HD1)
Title
Relating To Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-20-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-22 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS deferred the measure until 02-06-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB7 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Medicaid
Supportive Housing Services
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Medicaid
Supportive Housing Services