HI SB699 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB699
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the work of the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History. (SB699 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Bernice Pauahi Bishop Museum.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TIA, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 644) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB699 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Re-referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 35