HI SB696 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB696

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends various reporting deadlines and the sunset date of the cesspool conversion working group established pursuant to Act 132, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018. Extends the lapse dates for funds appropriated to conduct a comprehensive statewide study of sewage contamination in nearshore marine areas and for research and technical assistance necessary for completion of the comprehensive cesspool conversion plan. (SB696 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cesspools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1512) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 218) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:25PM in conference room 224.
2019-02-05SenateRe-Referred to AEN, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB696 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback