HI SB692 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB692

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Department of Education to support wide-ranging initiatives for student success. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-11 Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
2023-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2023-02-17SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2023-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
2023-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB692 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback