HI SB690 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB690
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conditions the designation of community-based subsistence fishing areas upon approval of the affected community.
Title
Relating To Fishing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB690 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HB496 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
HB496 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=690&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB690_.HTM |