HI SB690 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB690
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a state civil service position to effectively track and monitor funds and expenditures related to habitat conservation plans and perform other tasks to benefit the recovery of threatened and endangered species.
Title
Relating To Conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB815 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB690 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB690 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=690&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB690_.HTM |