HI SB684 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB684

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Conforms existing Medicaid requirements to health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to cover services provided through telehealth, including by way of an interactive telecommunications system. Defines "interactive telecommunications system" to match the 2022 Medicare physician fee schedule final rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Telephonic Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
2023-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-15-23 1:00PM; CR 225.
2023-02-13SenateThe committee on LBT deferred the measure.
2023-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on LBT/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to LBT/HHS, CPN.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB684 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback