HI SB684 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB684

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a county to first seek revenue from alternative sources, including advertising, before imposing any new mass transit fare or fare increase. Requires prior approval of a new fare or fare increase from the department of transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to TRS/PSM, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB684 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback