HI SB682 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a system of medical marijuana dispensaries and production centers. Requires that the number of licensed dispensaries and production centers increase gradually over an initial phase-in period. Prohibits counties from enacting zoning regulations that discriminate against licensed dispensaries and production centers. Allows a qualifying patient, primary caregiver, or an owner or employee of a medical marijuana production center or dispensary to transport medical marijuana in any public place, under certain conditions. Replaces the requirement that a certifying physician be the qualifying patient's primary care physician with a requirement that the physician have a bona fide physician-patient relationship with the qualifying patient. Prohibits primary caregivers from cultivating medical marijuana after 6/30/2018, subject to certain exceptions. Appropriates funds. (HD1)
Title
Medical Marijuana; Patients and Caregivers; Protections; Certifying Physician
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero, Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Ichiyama, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, Har, Kong, McDermott, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1658), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Pouha; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from HLT/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Woodson, McDermott. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/JUD on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Re-referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |