HI SB679 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employees with up to eight weeks of paid family leave during a one-year period paid through an employer based private insurance program currently used to provide for temporary disability benefits. Repeals chapter 398, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Family Leave And Temporary Disability Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 3:20PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, CPN/JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB679 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
HB466 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB466 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=679&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB679_.HTM |