HI SB675 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that real estate investment trusts file returns reporting their shareholders' pro rata shares of net income and net income attributable to this State. Requires withholding on all payments to shareholders. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2019.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=675&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB675_.HTM |