HI SB669 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB669

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of health to submit a request for an exception to regulations and a petition to initiate proceedings for federal rulemaking to the drug enforcement administration to clarify that the state-authorized use of cannabis does not violate federal controlled substances laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Controlled Substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to HTH/PSM, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB668 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB669 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH/PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback