HI SB666 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a green fee surcharge of $20 on transient accommodations for the purposes of funding workforce programs and services that promote certain environmental goals. Establishes a conservation workforce special fund. Repeals on 12/31/2031. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 248) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Riviere. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 3:30PM; CR224 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB666 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
HB805 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB805 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1