HI SB665 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB665
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines electric foot scooters and clarifies that laws relating to bicycles in general also apply to electric foot scooters. Requires an operator of an electric foot scooter to be at least fourteen years of age. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Foot Scooters.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPH. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/CPH. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB665 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPH.