HI SB661 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an advisory committee to assist the director of commerce and consumer affairs regarding regulation of the funeral industry. Establishes a pre-need cemetery and funeral special fund. Clarifies prohibited practices. Authorizes the director of commerce and consumer affairs to prohibit a pre-need authority from engaging in sales and withdrawals for failure to submit required audits. (SD2)
Title
Funeral Industry; Commerce and Consumer Protection; Advisory Committee; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: English, Hee, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-17-09 11:00 AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |