HI SB659 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state alternative transit fund to allow counties to offer free or nearly free fares on eco-friendly county buses. Imposes a fine for unlicensed transient accommodations. Establishes a surcharge on individual income over $2.5 million. Increases the rental motor vehicle and tour vehicle surcharge tax. Requires the new fine, surcharge, and tax increase to be deposited into the state alternative transit fund.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB659 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Climate Change
Individual Income Tax
Rental Motor Vehicle and Tour Vehicle Surcharge Tax
State Alternative Transit Fund
Transient Accommodation Tax
Transportation
Individual Income Tax
Rental Motor Vehicle and Tour Vehicle Surcharge Tax
State Alternative Transit Fund
Transient Accommodation Tax
Transportation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=659&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB659_.HTM |